Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 139 Today
» 909 Yesterday
» 139 Week
» 21980 Month
» 217434 Year
» 1101815 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 13140 29/04/1955
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3140 04/10/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 10
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 29/04/1955
Withdrawn 10/06/1968
Time in Service 13 yrs, 1 mth , 12 dys
Cut Up 01/03/1969
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
53C Hull Springhead (New) 29/04/1955
51A Darlington 5w/e 24/03/1956
51L Thornaby 5w/e 14/06/1958
   Withdrawn 10/06/1968

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
29/04/1955 Power Unit IH64147    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
29/04/1955 To Service To service as 13140
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Hull Springhead (53C)
   
24/03/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
09/1958 Renumbered Renumbered to D3140    
11/11/1961 Sightings Darlington Works visit: Around the Works - Crossing. SLS 1/1962 Link
10/06/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D3140    
01/03/1969 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev prev