Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 141 Today
» 909 Yesterday
» 141 Week
» 21982 Month
» 217436 Year
» 1101817 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 13141 04/05/1955
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3141 16/06/1959

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 10
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 04/05/1955
Withdrawn 05/07/1971
Time in Service 16 yrs, 2 mths , 1 dy
Cut Up 01/05/1972
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
53C Hull Springhead (New) 04/05/1955
51A Darlington 5w/e 24/03/1956
51L Thornaby 5w/e 14/06/1958
   Withdrawn 05/07/1971

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
04/05/1955 Power Unit IH63922    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
04/05/1955 To Service To service as 13141
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Hull Springhead (53C)
   
24/03/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
16/06/1959 Renumbered Renumbered to D3141    
05/07/1971 Withdrawn Condemned as D3141    
01/05/1972 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev prev