Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 140 Today
» 909 Yesterday
» 140 Week
» 21981 Month
» 217435 Year
» 1101816 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 13142 08/06/1955
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3142 09/07/1960

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 10
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 08/06/1955
Withdrawn 26/06/1968
Time in Service 13 yrs , 18 dys
Cut Up 01/03/1969
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
53A Hull Dairycoates (New) 08/06/1955
51A Darlington 4w/e 18/02/1956
51L Thornaby 5w/e 14/06/1958
   Withdrawn 26/06/1968

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
08/06/1955 Power Unit IH64049    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
08/06/1955 To Service To service as 13142
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)
   
18/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
09/07/1960 Renumbered Renumbered to D3142    
26/06/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D3142    
01/03/1969 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev prev