Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 738 Today
» 820 Yesterday
» 4141 Week
» 21090 Month
» 135351 Year
» 1019732 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 13143 08/06/1955
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3143 14/11/1959

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 10
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service 08/06/1955
Withdrawn 08/1969
Time in Service 14 yrs, 1 mth , 23 dys
Cut Up 01/03/1970
Cut At Cohens (Kettering)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
53A Hull Dairycoates (New) 08/06/1955
51A Darlington 4w/e 18/02/1956
51L Thornaby 5w/e 14/06/1958
   Withdrawn 08/1969

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
08/06/1955 Power Unit IH64314    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
08/06/1955 To Service To service as 13143
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)
   
18/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
14/11/1959 Renumbered Renumbered to D3143    
08/1969 Withdrawn Condemned as D3143    
01/03/1970 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Kettering    

prev prev