Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 141 Today
» 909 Yesterday
» 141 Week
» 21982 Month
» 217436 Year
» 1101817 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 13144 21/06/1955
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3144 20/02/1960

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 10
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 21/06/1955
Withdrawn 07/1969
Time in Service 14 yrs , 9 dys
Cut Up 01/10/1969
Cut At Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
51B Newport (Teeside) (New) 21/06/1955
51A Darlington 5w/e 21/01/1956
51L Thornaby 5w/e 14/06/1958
   Withdrawn 07/1969

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
21/06/1955 Power Unit IH64393    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
21/06/1955 To Service To service as 13144
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Newport (Teeside) (51B)
   
21/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
20/02/1960 Renumbered Renumbered to D3144    
07/1969 Withdrawn Condemned as D3144    
01/10/1969 Scrapped Broken up by Hughes Bolckows: North Blyth    

prev prev