Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 139 Today
» 909 Yesterday
» 139 Week
» 21980 Month
» 217434 Year
» 1101815 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 13145 22/06/1955
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3145 15/06/1957

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 10
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 22/06/1955
Withdrawn 23/04/1972
Time in Service 16 yrs, 10 mths , 1 dy
Cut Up 01/12/1972
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
51B Newport (Teeside) (New) 22/06/1955
51A Darlington 5w/e 21/01/1956
51L Thornaby 5w/e 14/06/1958
   Withdrawn 23/04/1972

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
22/06/1955 Power Unit IH64392    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
22/06/1955 To Service To service as 13145
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Newport (Teeside) (51B)
   
21/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
05/1957 Renumbered Renumbered to D3145    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
23/04/1972 Withdrawn Condemned as D3145    
01/12/1972 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev prev