Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 87 Today
» 865 Yesterday
» 952 Week
» 13985 Month
» 236386 Year
» 1120767 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 3145 m/e 03/1906
GWR (51xx) 5145 m/e 03/1928
GWR (81xx) 8103 m/e 11/1938

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 3100/5100
Company History GWR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
310003/1906
510003/1928
810011/1938
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 03/1906
Withdrawal Thu 28/11/1963
Service Life 57 yrs, 8 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
87G Carmarthen 4w/e 01/11/1952
87H Neyland 4w/e 31/10/1959
87G Carmarthen 4w/e 28/11/1959
87F Llanelly 4w/e 14/07/1962
88G Llantrisant 4w/e 28/09/1963
88B Radyr 4w/e 02/11/1963
   Withdrawn 28/11/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1911 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also

prev prev