Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 129 Today
» 869 Yesterday
» 129 Week
» 18251 Month
» 187023 Year
» 1071404 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 13147 12/07/1955
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3147 11/07/1959

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 10
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 12/07/1955
Withdrawn 06/05/1968
Time in Service 12 yrs, 9 mths , 24 dys
Cut Up 01/02/1969
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
51B Newport (Teeside) (New) 12/07/1955
51A Darlington 5w/e 21/01/1956
51L Thornaby 5w/e 14/06/1958
   Withdrawn 06/05/1968

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
12/07/1955 Power Unit IH64648    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
12/07/1955 To Service To service as 13147
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Newport (Teeside) (51B)
   
21/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
11/07/1959 Renumbered Renumbered to D3147    
06/05/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D3147    
01/02/1969 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev prev