Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 123 Today
» 843 Yesterday
» 2706 Week
» 19655 Month
» 133916 Year
» 1018297 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 13148 15/07/1955
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3148 29/11/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 10
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service 15/07/1955
Withdrawn 05/03/1968
Time in Service 12 yrs, 7 mths , 19 dys
Cut Up 01/03/1969
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
51B Newport (Teeside) (New) 15/07/1955
51A Darlington 5w/e 21/01/1956
51L Thornaby 5w/e 14/06/1958
   Withdrawn 05/03/1968

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
15/07/1955 Power Unit IH64811    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
15/07/1955 To Service To service as 13148
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Newport (Teeside) (51B)
   
21/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
11/1958 Renumbered Renumbered to D3148    
05/03/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D3148    
01/03/1969 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev prev