Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 139 Today
» 909 Yesterday
» 139 Week
» 21980 Month
» 217434 Year
» 1101815 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 13149 21/07/1955
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3149 29/09/1959

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 10
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 21/07/1955
Withdrawn 02/07/1970
Time in Service 14 yrs, 11 mths , 11 dys
Cut Up 01/11/1970
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
51B Newport (Teeside) (New) 21/07/1955
51A Darlington 5w/e 21/01/1956
51L Thornaby 5w/e 14/06/1958
   Withdrawn 02/07/1970

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
21/07/1955 Power Unit IH64538    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
21/07/1955 To Service To service as 13149
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Newport (Teeside) (51B)
   
21/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
29/09/1959 Renumbered Renumbered to D3149    
02/07/1970 Withdrawn Condemned as D3149    
01/11/1970 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev prev