Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 112 Today
» 909 Yesterday
» 112 Week
» 21953 Month
» 217407 Year
» 1101788 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 13151 08/08/1955
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3151 02/1959

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 10
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 08/08/1955
Withdrawn 04/12/1967
Time in Service 12 yrs, 3 mths , 26 dys
Cut Up 01/04/1968
Cut At Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
51B Newport (Teeside) (New) 08/08/1955
51A Darlington 5w/e 21/01/1956
51L Thornaby 5w/e 14/06/1958
   Withdrawn 04/12/1967

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
08/08/1955 Power Unit IH64944    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
08/08/1955 To Service To service as 13151
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Newport (Teeside) (51B)
   
21/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
02/1959 Renumbered Renumbered to D3151    
04/12/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as D3151    
01/04/1968 Scrapped Broken up by Hughes Bolckows: North Blyth    

prev prev