Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 314 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18117 Week
» 71133 Month
» 190660 Year
» 3217513 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
3153 |
m/e |
04/1907 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
3150 |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
169 |
Works Number |
2241 |
To Service |
During 04/1907 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 13/02/1953 |
Service Life |
45 yrs, 10 mths , 13 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
28/02/1953 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1907 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 3153 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2241 |
|
|
16/11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Truro (TR) |
|
|
11/01/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (GLO) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Gloucester Horton Road (GLO) |
|
|
13/02/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3153 |
|
|