Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 2609 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16015 Week
» 69031 Month
» 188558 Year
» 3215411 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13154 |
17/02/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3154 |
10/12/1958 |
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
17/02/1955 |
Power Unit IH63436 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/02/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13154 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
10/12/1958 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3154 |
|
|
05/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (16B) |
|
|
15/07/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3154 |
|
|
02/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|