Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 258 Today
» 838 Yesterday
» 4499 Week
» 21448 Month
» 135709 Year
» 1020090 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 13160 16/08/1955
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3160 09/04/1960

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built D3/5
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service 16/08/1955
Withdrawn 14/10/1967
Time in Service 12 yrs, 1 mth , 28 dys
Cut Up 01/04/1968
Cut At Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
40B Immingham (New) 16/08/1955
34A Kings Cross 4w/e 18/02/1956
40B Immingham 4w/e 18/05/1957
16B Colwick w/e 05/02/1966
   Withdrawn 14/10/1967

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
16/08/1955 Power Unit IH64729    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
16/08/1955 To Service To service as 13160
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Immingham (40B)
   
18/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A)    
18/05/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
09/04/1960 Renumbered Renumbered to D3160    
05/02/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (16B)    
14/10/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as D3160    
01/04/1968 Scrapped Broken up by Slag Reduction Co.: Ickles    

prev prev