Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1572 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14978 Week
» 67994 Month
» 187521 Year
» 3214374 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13163 |
20/09/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3163 |
22/07/1960 |
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
20/09/1955 |
Power Unit IH64048 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/09/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13163 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
05/01/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
22/07/1960 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3163 |
|
|
17/09/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3163 |
|
|
01/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|