Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 777 Today
» 1171 Yesterday
» 4394 Week
» 16099 Month
» 347588 Year
» 424175 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 13167 24/08/1955
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3167 07/07/1962
TOPS (Tops) 08102 04/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service 24/08/1955
Withdrawn 14/03/1988 off Doncaster (DR)
Time in Service 32 yrs, 6 mths , 19 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
21A Saltley (New) 24/08/1955
DR Doncaster 3w/e 04/01/1976
91E To Eastern Region 2w/e 10/01/1976
   Withdrawn 14/03/1988

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
24/08/1955 To Service To service as 13167
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Saltley (21A)
   
08/06/1962 Sightings Derby Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. SLS 7/1962 Link
07/07/1962 Renumbered Renumbered to D3167    
04/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08102    
04/01/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DR)    
10/01/1976 Allocation Reallocated to To Eastern Region (91E)    
14/03/1988 Withdrawn Condemned as 08102 from Doncaster (DR)    

prev prev