Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 1024 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18827 Week
» 71843 Month
» 191370 Year
» 3218223 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13167 |
24/08/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3167 |
07/07/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08102 |
04/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
08 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
24/08/1955 to Saltley (21A) |
Withdrawn |
14/03/1988 off Doncaster (DR) |
Time in Service |
32 yrs, 6 mths , 19 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 07/1969 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 10/1969 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 12/1975 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/08/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/08/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13167 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
07/07/1962 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3167 |
|
|
07/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
10/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08102 |
|
|
12/1975 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
04/01/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (DR) |
|
|
10/01/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Eastern Region (91E) |
|
|
14/03/1988 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08102 from Doncaster (DR) |
|
|