Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2567 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15973 Week
» 68989 Month
» 188516 Year
» 3215369 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D317 |
06/02/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40117 |
04/11/1973 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
40 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
06/02/1961 to Crewe North (5A) |
Withdrawn |
07/09/1981 off Longsight (LO) |
Time in Service |
20 yrs, 7 mths , 1 dy |
Cut Up |
11/1983 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Information |
Due for Classified repair,loss of power |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
06/02/1961 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 06/01/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
04/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
11/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
11/1973 |
|
EQ Brakes Removed |
|
|
|
|
01/1974 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
06/02/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 06/01/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
04/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
11/1973 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
01/1974 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/02/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D317 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd Allocated to Crewe North (5A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
25/02/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
28/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
07/03/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
28/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
09/12/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
06/01/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
04/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
30/08/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
25/03/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
11/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
11/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Removed |
|
|
04/11/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40117 |
|
|
01/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
07/09/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40117 from Longsight (LO) |
|
|
11/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|