Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 1 Online
» 302 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18105 Week
» 71121 Month
» 190648 Year
» 3217501 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13173 |
20/09/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3173 |
13/02/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08107 |
06/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/09/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/09/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13173 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
25/02/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
13/02/1960 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3173 |
|
|
22/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
06/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08107 |
|
|
19/12/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08107 from Carlisle Kingmoor (KD) |
|
|
03/03/1984 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|