Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1524 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19327 Week
» 72343 Month
» 191870 Year
» 3218723 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
3173 |
m/e |
10/1907 |
Great Western Railway (31xx) |
3100 |
on |
10/12/1938 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
31xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
172 |
Works Number |
2282 |
To Service |
During 10/1907 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 20/05/1957 |
Service Life |
49 yrs, 7 mths , 20 dys |
Total Mileage |
463,836 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1907 |
TDU |
|
Tondu |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
20/05/1957 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
TDU |
Tondu |
w/e |
02/11/1946 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/05/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1907 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 3173 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2282 |
|
|
10/12/1938 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3100 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Tondu (TDU) |
|
|
20/05/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3100 |
|
|
25/02/1961 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|