Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2967 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16373 Week
» 69389 Month
» 188916 Year
» 3215769 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13178 |
06/10/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3178 |
05/05/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08112 |
09/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
06/10/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/10/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13178 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
01/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
16/06/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
05/05/1962 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3178 |
|
|
10/02/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
31/03/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
09/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08112 |
|
|
05/04/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
04/07/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08112 from Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
07/04/1984 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|