Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 1438 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19241 Week
» 72257 Month
» 191784 Year
» 3218637 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13179 |
07/10/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3179 |
05/11/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08113 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
02/1968 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
07/10/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/10/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13179 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
16/06/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
05/11/1960 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3179 |
|
|
02/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
06/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08113 |
|
|
27/07/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
02/11/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
08/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Blazey (BZ) |
|
|
18/03/1984 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08113 from Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
30/04/2007 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Morley Waste Traders: Leeds |
|
|