Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 297 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18100 Week
» 71116 Month
» 190643 Year
» 3217496 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D318 |
20/02/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40118 |
21/12/1973 |
|
Departmental (Dept) |
97408 |
20/05/1985 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
40 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
Class | From | 40 | 20/02/1961 | 97/4 | 20/05/1985 |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
20/02/1961 to Crewe North (5A) |
Withdrawn |
26/02/1986 |
Time in Service |
25 yrs , 6 dys |
Information |
Failed Camshaft,Surplus to requirements |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
20/02/1961 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
12/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
12/1973 |
|
EQ Brakes Removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/02/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
03/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
12/1973 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/02/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D318 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd Allocated to Crewe North (5A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
25/03/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Camden (1B) |
|
|
08/04/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
20/05/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Camden (1B) |
|
|
04/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
02/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) |
|
|
03/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
10/05/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
03/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
12/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
12/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Removed |
|
|
21/12/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40118 |
|
|
20/05/1985 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
20/05/1985 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 97408 |
|
|
26/02/1986 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 97408 |
|
|