Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 817 Today
» 986 Yesterday
» 2725 Week
» 18923 Month
» 183823 Year
» 694925 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D318 20/02/1961
TOPS (Tops) 40118 21/12/1973
Departmental (Dept) 97408 20/05/1985

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 40
Wheels 1Co-Co1
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
To Service 20/02/1961
Withdrawn 26/02/1986
Time in Service 25 yrs , 6 dys
Information Failed Camshaft,Surplus to requirements
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
5A Crewe North (New) 20/02/1961
1B Camden w/e 25/03/1961
5A Crewe North w/e 08/04/1961
1B Camden w/e 20/05/1961
5A Crewe North w/e 04/11/1961
1E Bletchley w/e 02/10/1965
5A Crewe Diesel w/e 03/01/1966
WL Western Lines (LMR) 18/04/1966
D05 Stoke Division 17/06/1968
D09 Manchester Division w/e 10/05/1969
   Withdrawn 01/02/1985
CD Crewe Diesel (Reinstated) 20/05/1985
   Withdrawn 26/02/1986

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
20/02/1961 To Service To service as D318
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Allocated to Crewe North (5A)
   
25/03/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Camden (1B)    
08/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe North (5A)    
20/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Camden (1B)    
04/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe North (5A)    
02/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Bletchley (1E)    
03/01/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A)    
18/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL)    
17/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05)    
10/05/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09)    
12/1973 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
12/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 40118    
26/02/1986 Withdrawn Condemned as 40118    

prev prev