Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 1031 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18834 Week
» 71850 Month
» 191377 Year
» 3218230 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13186 |
04/11/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3186 |
06/10/1961 |
At Swindon Factory |
TOPS (Tops) |
08119 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 12/1975 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
04/11/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/11/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13186 Built at Derby Works Allocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
|
|
06/10/1961 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3186 |
|
|
04/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
15/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88M) |
|
|
04/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Margam (87B) |
|
|
28/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
19/09/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southall (81C) |
|
|
07/11/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
31/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|
18/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
15/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
22/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (16A) |
|
|
27/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
29/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08119 |
|
|
11/01/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (EJ) |
|
|
12/1975 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
12/1976 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
01/06/1979 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08119 from Wath (WH) |
|
|
02/1980 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|