Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 4004 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 22915 Week
» 87869 Month
» 290533 Year
» 3317386 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D319 |
09/03/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40119 |
21/11/1973 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
40 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
09/03/1961 to Crewe North (5A) |
Withdrawn |
14/12/1980 |
Time in Service |
19 yrs, 9 mths , 5 dys |
Cut Up |
m/e 10/1982 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
09/03/1961 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
09/03/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/03/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D319 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd Allocated to Crewe North (5A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
11/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
06/02/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
05/02/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
21/11/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40119 |
|
|
14/12/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40119 |
|
|
10/1982 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|