Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 2940 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16346 Week
» 69362 Month
» 188889 Year
» 3215742 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
3190 |
m/e |
01/1908 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
3150 |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
172 |
Works Number |
2299 |
To Service |
During 01/1908 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 24/03/1958 |
Service Life |
50 yrs, 2 mths , 21 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
01/1908 |
STJ |
|
Severn Tunnel Junction |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
24/03/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/03/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1908 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 3190 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2299 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Severn Tunnel Junction (STJ) |
|
|
24/03/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3190 |
|
|
17/05/1958 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|