Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1495 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14901 Week
» 67917 Month
» 187444 Year
» 3214297 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13192 |
18/11/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3192 |
13/04/1960 |
At Swindon Works |
TOPS (Tops) |
08125 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/11/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/11/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13192 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Shrewsbury (84G) |
|
|
31/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
13/04/1960 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3192 |
|
|
10/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (84F) |
|
|
22/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (2F) |
|
|
12/07/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Allerton (8J) |
|
|
01/11/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
10/01/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Allerton (8J) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08125 |
|
|
28/12/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
02/08/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
31/12/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08125 from Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
25/02/1984 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|