Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 106 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 2552 Week
» 14257 Month
» 345746 Year
» 422333 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 13193 22/11/1955
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3193 02/02/1961

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service 22/11/1955
Withdrawn 16/09/1967
Time in Service 11 yrs, 9 mths , 25 dys
Cut Up 01/09/1967
Cut At Locomotive Works (Derby)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
84G Shrewsbury (New) 22/11/1955
   Withdrawn 16/09/1967


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
22/11/1955 To Service To service as 13193
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Shrewsbury (84G)
   
02/1961 Renumbered Renumbered to D3193    
01/09/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Derby    
16/09/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as D3193    

prev prev