Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 295 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18098 Week
» 71114 Month
» 190641 Year
» 3217494 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13195 |
25/11/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3195 |
06/11/1959 |
At Swindon Works |
TOPS (Tops) |
08127 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
25/11/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/11/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13195 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D) |
|
|
06/11/1959 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3195 |
|
|
27/07/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxford (81F) |
|
|
18/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
09/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
05/04/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
10/10/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
24/10/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08127 |
|
|
03/08/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08127 from Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
12/1980 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|