Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 844 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14250 Week
» 67266 Month
» 186793 Year
» 3213646 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13197 |
30/12/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3197 |
29/02/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08129 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 12/1975 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/12/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/12/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13197 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
29/02/1960 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3197 |
|
|
16/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hamilton (West) (66C) |
|
|
30/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hamilton (West) (66C) |
|
|
30/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
26/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
09/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
11/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Allerton (8J) |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (NH) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08129 |
|
|
12/1975 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
16/08/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
17/07/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08129 from Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
21/04/1984 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|