Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 15 Today
» 1358 Yesterday
» 6230 Week
» 17935 Month
» 349424 Year
» 426011 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3199 c. 0
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 13199 08/12/1955
TOPS (Tops) 08131 03/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service 08/12/1955
Withdrawn 15/03/1981 off Doncaster (DR)
Time in Service 25 yrs, 3 mths , 7 dys
Cut Up 01/08/1981
Cut At Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
66A Polmadie (New) 08/12/1955
67C Ayr 5w/e 31/12/1966
36A Doncaster w/e 20/01/1973
41A Tinsley 4w/e 27/01/1973
   Withdrawn 15/03/1981


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
0000 Renumbered Renumbered to D3199    
08/12/1955 To Service To service as 13199
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Polmadie (66A)
   
31/12/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Ayr (67C)    
20/01/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
27/01/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
03/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08131    
15/03/1981 Withdrawn Condemned as 08131 from Doncaster (DR)    
01/08/1981 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev