Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 498 Today
» 1165 Yesterday
» 5099 Week
» 16646 Month
» 416328 Year
» 492915 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 13201 16/12/1955
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3201 31/03/1960
TOPS (Tops) 08133 10/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service 16/12/1955
Withdrawn 21/09/1980 off Lincoln (LN)
Time in Service 24 yrs, 9 mths , 5 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
66A Polmadie (New) 16/12/1955
66C Hamilton (West) 5w/e 07/09/1963
67A Corkerhill 5w/e 30/05/1964
67C Ayr 8w/e 26/03/1966
40A Lincoln w/e 26/10/1968
   Withdrawn 21/09/1980

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
16/12/1955 To Service To service as 13201
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Polmadie (66A)
   
03/1960 Renumbered Renumbered to D3201    
07/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Hamilton (West) (66C)    
30/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A)    
26/03/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Ayr (67C)    
26/10/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
10/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 08133    
21/09/1980 Withdrawn Condemned as 08133 from Lincoln (LN)    

prev prev