|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
02/07/1961 | Stafford Road Works (Works Yard) | Erecting Shop: 1455, 2217, 3210, 3610, 3792, 4110/20, 4290, 4703, 4910/96, 5416, 5563/8/70, 5679, 5957, 6611/68, 7308/39, 7403, 8403, 9464, 9674, 9778. Weigh House : D3034, 1011. Works Yard: 1003/7, 2249, 3201, 3618, 4591, 5548, 5694, 5933, 6314, 6424, 6688, 7244, 73037. | SLS/196108 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
30/09/1946 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 3201 Built at Swindon Works |
||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Machynlleth (MCH) | ||
16/07/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Oswestry (89A) | ||
29/11/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wrexham Rhosddu (84K) | ||
11/07/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Croes Newydd (84J) | ||
08/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) | ||
13/04/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Templecombe (S&D) (83G) | ||
21/05/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3201 | ||
08/1965 | Scrapped | Scrapped |