Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 212 Today
» 1182 Yesterday
» 4849 Week
» 16142 Month
» 280775 Year
» 1502340 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 13202 16/12/1955  
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3202 15/07/1960  
TOPS (Tops) 08134 05/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service 16/12/1955 to Motherwell (66B)
Withdrawn 20/08/1981 off Saltley (SY)
Time in Service 25 yrs, 8 mths , 4 dys
Cut Up 01/12/1986
Cut At Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
66B Motherwell (New) on 16/12/1955
66C Hamilton (West) 4w/e 16/03/1963
12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 05/11/1966
12D Workington w/e 19/11/1966
12C Barrow in Furness w/e 21/01/1967
67C Ayr 5w/e 01/04/1972
12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 06/05/1972
8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 13/01/1973
KM Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 30/06/1973
SY Saltley w/e 06/07/1974
   Withdrawn on 20/08/1981


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
16/12/1955 To Service To service as 13202
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Motherwell (66B)
   
15/07/1960 Renumbered Renumbered to D3202    
16/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Hamilton (West) (66C)    
05/11/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
19/11/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Workington (12D)    
21/01/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12C)    
01/04/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Ayr (67C)    
06/05/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
13/01/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
30/06/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (KM)    
05/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08134    
06/07/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (SY)    
20/08/1981 Withdrawn Condemned as 08134 from Saltley (SY)    
01/12/1986 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev