Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 239 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6023 Week
» 27412 Month
» 146939 Year
» 3173792 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
3202 |
on |
05/10/1946 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
2251 |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
360 |
To Service |
Mon 05/10/1946 to Oswestry (OSY) |
Withdrawal |
Mon 20/06/1960 |
Service Life |
13 yrs, 8 mths , 15 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1960 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
OSY |
Oswestry |
m/e |
31/10/1946 |
ALLOC |
MCH |
Machynlleth |
4w/e |
28/01/1950 |
ALLOC |
89A |
Oswestry |
4w/e |
16/07/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
30/06/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/10/1946 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 3202 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Oswestry (OSY) |
|
|
28/01/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Machynlleth (MCH) |
|
|
16/07/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oswestry (89A) |
|
|
20/06/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3202 |
|
|
08/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|