Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 775 Today
» 1015 Yesterday
» 4943 Week
» 20057 Month
» 323247 Year
» 1544812 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 13203 21/12/1955  
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3203 31/12/1958  
TOPS (Tops) 08135 03/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service 21/12/1955 to Motherwell (66B)
Withdrawn 12/02/1977 off Ebbw Junction (Newport) (EJ)
Time in Service 21 yrs, 1 mth , 22 dys
Cut Up 01/03/1977
Cut At Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
66B Motherwell (New) on 21/12/1955
66C Hamilton (West) 4w/e 16/03/1963
EJ Ebbw Junction (Newport) w/e 09/02/1974
   Withdrawn on 12/02/1977


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
21/12/1955 To Service To service as 13203
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Motherwell (66B)
   
12/1958 Renumbered Renumbered to D3203    
16/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Hamilton (West) (66C)    
09/02/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (EJ)    
03/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08135    
12/02/1977 Withdrawn Condemned as 08135 from Ebbw Junction (Newport) (EJ)    
01/03/1977 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev