Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 1591 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 7375 Week
» 28764 Month
» 148291 Year
» 3175144 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
3203 |
on |
09/10/1946 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
2251 |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
360 |
To Service |
Sat 09/10/1946 to Shrewsbury (SALOP) |
Withdrawal |
Sat 28/12/1963 |
Service Life |
17 yrs, 2 mths , 19 dys |
Total Mileage |
333,103 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/10/1946 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 3203 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
30/11/1946 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Croes Newydd (CNYD) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Croes Newydd (CNYD) |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G) |
|
|
31/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G) |
|
|
09/08/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oswestry (89A) |
|
|
31/08/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oswestry (89A) |
|
|
04/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G) |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|
28/12/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3203 |
|
|
04/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|