Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1748 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19551 Week
» 72567 Month
» 192094 Year
» 3218947 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13204 |
21/12/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3204 |
30/04/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08136 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
21/12/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/12/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13204 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Motherwell (66B) |
|
|
30/04/1960 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3204 |
|
|
16/03/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hamilton (West) (66C) |
|
|
15/04/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08136 |
|
|
07/08/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08136 from York (North) (YK) |
|
|
12/1984 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|