Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 30 Online
» 1772 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 7556 Week
» 28945 Month
» 148472 Year
» 3175325 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
3204 |
on |
11/10/1946 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
2251 |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
360 |
To Service |
Fri 11/10/1946 to Gloucester Horton Road (GLO) |
Withdrawal |
Fri 01/03/1963 |
Service Life |
16 yrs, 4 mths , 18 dys |
Total Mileage |
315,189 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/10/1946 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 3204 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Gloucester Horton Road (GLO) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cheltenham Malvern Road (CHEL) |
|
|
09/10/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Worcester (85A) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oswestry (89A) |
|
|
01/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wrexham Rhosddu (84K) |
|
|
16/01/1959 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
17/02/1960 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Worcester (85A) |
|
|
12/08/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (89A) |
|
|
12/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hereford (86C) |
|
|
01/03/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3204 |
|
|
10/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|