Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 69 Today
» 1240 Yesterday
» 4926 Week
» 16631 Month
» 348120 Year
» 424707 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 3205   18/10/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class 2251
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Fri 18/10/1946
Withdrawal During 05/1965
Service Life 18 yrs, 6 mths , 12 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
85A Worcester 4w/e 18/06/1955
85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 10/09/1955
85A Worcester 4w/e 08/10/1955
84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 13/08/1960
89C Machynlleth 4w/e 22/04/1961
89A Shrewsbury 4w/e 17/06/1961
86C Hereford 4w/e 12/01/1963
83D Exmouth Junction 4w/e 28/12/1963
83D Exmouth Junction 4w/e 27/12/1964
   Withdrawn m/e 05/1965
83G Templecombe (S&D) 5w/e 16/05/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW GLO Gloucester Horton Road m/e 31/10/1946
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 8w/e 03/11/1951
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 18/06/1955
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 10/09/1955
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 08/10/1955
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 13/08/1960
ALLOC 89C Machynlleth 4w/e 22/04/1961
ALLOC 89A Shrewsbury 4w/e 17/06/1961
ALLOC 86C Hereford 4w/e 12/01/1963
TOSTORE   5w/e 02/11/1963
ALLOC 83D Exmouth Junction 4w/e 31/12/1963
TOSTORE   3w/e 20/07/1964
ALLOC 83D Exmouth Junction 3w/e 19/12/1964
ALLOC 83D Exmouth Junction 5w/e 04/01/1965
ALLOC 83G Templecombe (S&D) 5w/e 16/05/1965
WDN   4w/e 13/06/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1946 To Service To service as GWR Number 3205
Built at Swindon Works
   
17/08/1954 Sightings Wolverhampton Works visit: Around the works. RO 9/1954 Link
18/06/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
10/09/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
08/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
13/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
22/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Machynlleth (89C)    
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (89A)    
12/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Hereford (86C)    
28/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (83D)    
27/12/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (83D)    
05/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 3205    
16/05/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Templecombe (S&D) (83G)    

prev prev