Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1300 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 7084 Week
» 28473 Month
» 148000 Year
» 3174853 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
3206 |
on |
21/10/1946 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
2251 |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
360 |
To Service |
Sat 21/10/1946 to Croes Newydd (CNYD) |
Withdrawal |
Sat 28/12/1963 |
Service Life |
17 yrs, 2 mths , 7 dys |
Total Mileage |
374,404 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/10/1946 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 3206 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Croes Newydd (CNYD) |
|
|
16/05/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (84F) |
|
|
30/01/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Didcot (81E) |
|
|
10/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fishguard Goodwick (87J) |
|
|
16/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Templecombe (S&D) (82G) |
|
|
28/12/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3206 |
|
|
05/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|