Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 1583 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19386 Week
» 72402 Month
» 191929 Year
» 3218782 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13207 |
26/01/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3207 |
28/02/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08139 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
26/01/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/01/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13207 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
28/02/1958 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3207 |
|
|
25/07/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ayr (67C) |
|
|
04/01/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08139 |
|
|
21/09/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08139 from March (MR) |
|
|
04/1982 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|