Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1807 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19610 Week
» 72626 Month
» 192153 Year
» 3219006 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13208 |
03/02/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3208 |
31/07/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08140 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 08/1969 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
03/02/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/02/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13208 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
31/07/1958 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3208 |
|
|
25/07/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ayr (67C) |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
16/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08140 |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
12/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
05/1977 |
To Store |
To Store (Swindon) |
|
|
06/1977 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|
02/06/1977 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08140 from Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|