|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
02/07/1961 | Stafford Road Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: 1455, 2217, 3210, 3610, 3792, 4110/20, 4290, 4703, 4910/96, 5416, 5563/8/70, 5679, 5957, 6611/68, 7308/39, 7403, 8403, 9464, 9674, 9778. Weigh House : D3034, 1011. Works Yard: 1003/7, 2249, 3201, 3618, 4591, 5548, 5694, 5933, 6314, 6424, 6688, 7244, 73037. | SLS/196108 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/12/1947 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 3210 Built at Swindon Works |
||
16/07/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Croes Newydd (84J) | ||
05/11/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Templecombe (S&D) (82G) | ||
13/11/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3210 | ||
02/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |