Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1094 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6878 Week
» 28267 Month
» 147794 Year
» 3174647 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
3212 |
on |
09/12/1947 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
2251 |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
360 |
To Service |
Mon 09/12/1947 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 21/10/1963 |
Service Life |
15 yrs, 10 mths , 12 dys |
Total Mileage |
385,796 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/12/1947 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 3212 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
11/07/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Westbury (82D) |
|
|
21/05/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fishguard Goodwick (87J) |
|
|
10/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Westbury (82D) |
|
|
14/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E) |
|
|
21/10/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3212 |
|
|
12/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|