Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1402 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 7186 Week
» 28575 Month
» 148102 Year
» 3174955 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
3213 |
on |
11/12/1947 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
2251 |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
360 |
To Service |
Sat 11/12/1947 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 28/12/1963 off Machynlleth (89C) |
Service Life |
16 yrs , 17 dys |
Total Mileage |
319,797 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
08/04/1962 |
Oswestry Works |
823, 1438, 3213, 3789, 7413, 7819, 46520. |
SLS/196205 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/12/1947 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 3213 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
06/11/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Worcester (85A) |
|
|
13/08/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Machynlleth (89C) |
|
|
15/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Worcester (85A) |
|
|
28/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D) |
|
|
28/12/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3213 from Machynlleth (89C) |
|
|
04/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|