Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1784 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 7568 Week
» 28957 Month
» 148484 Year
» 3175337 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
3214 |
on |
15/12/1947 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
2251 |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
360 |
To Service |
Fri 15/12/1947 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 25/10/1963 |
Service Life |
15 yrs, 10 mths , 10 dys |
Total Mileage |
349,013 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1964 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
15/12/1947 |
89D |
|
Oswestry |
4w/e |
08/10/1960 |
87H |
|
Neyland |
4w/e |
27/01/1962 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
25/10/1963 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
UNK |
|
m/e |
31/12/1947 |
1STALLOC |
WOS |
Worcester |
m/e |
31/01/1948 |
ALLOC |
89A |
Shrewsbury |
4w/e |
05/10/1960 |
ALLOC |
87H |
Neyland |
4w/e |
27/01/1962 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
29/09/1963 |
WDN |
|
|
5w/e |
02/11/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/12/1947 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 3214 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
08/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oswestry (89D) |
|
|
27/01/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neyland (87H) |
|
|
25/10/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3214 |
|
|
01/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|