Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 3023 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16429 Week
» 69445 Month
» 188972 Year
» 3215825 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13215 |
16/03/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3215 |
25/02/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08147 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/03/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/03/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13215 Built at Derby Works Allocated to St Rollox (Balornock) (65B) |
|
|
25/02/1961 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3215 |
|
|
02/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F) |
|
|
04/12/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A) |
|
|
30/12/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C) |
|
|
22/07/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08147 |
|
|
17/07/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08147 from Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
08/12/1984 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|