Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 710 Today
» 1257 Yesterday
» 710 Week
» 12003 Month
» 276636 Year
» 1498201 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 3217 on 24/12/1947

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 2251
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 360
To Service Sat 24/12/1947
Withdrawal w/e Sat 14/11/1964
Scrapping During 12/1964 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 16 yrs, 10 mths , 21 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 24/12/1947
84F Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 16/05/1953
85A Worcester 4w/e 30/01/1954
81F Oxford 4w/e 24/04/1954
85A Worcester 4w/e 18/06/1955
84C Banbury 4w/e 26/03/1960
84D Leamington 4w/e 16/06/1962
   Withdrawn w/e 14/11/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW UNK   m/e 31/12/1947
1STALLOC SALOP Shrewsbury m/e 31/01/1948
ALLOC 84F Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 16/05/1953
ALLOC 85A Worcester 5w/e 30/01/1954
ALLOC 81F Oxford 4w/e 24/04/1954
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 18/06/1955
ALLOC 84C Banbury 4w/e 26/03/1960
ALLOC 84D Leamington m/e 30/06/1962
WDN   w/e 14/11/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/01/1961 Leamington MPD Stratford-on-Avon sub-shed was transferred from Tyseley-Leamington w.e.f. 2/1/61 with its allocation of 4 Colletts (2211/57/67, 3217) to cover two pilot jobs, banking duties and spare engine for SMJ line. (2257 worked to Blisworth during December). SLS/196103
19/08/1962 Wolverhampton Works (Awaiting works) In Works: 1020, 1630, 3615, 3721, 4636, 4697, 4703, 5181/4, 5564, 6160, 6614/8, 7739, 7816, 8104, 9422/70, 9613/24/6/47/65, 82008; Weigh house: 6156; Awaiting works: 3217, 4938/61, 5065, 5658, 7002, 7824, 9415. SLS/196209
14/10/1962 Wolverhampton Stafford Road Works 1628/60, 2841/62, 3217, 3608/58, 3709/15/51/60/78, 4147, 4910/51, 5070, 5245, 5602, 6141, 6644/63/79, 6816, 6982, 7209, 8498, 9411/53, 9608/10/5/40/82. Ex-Works on shed: 9404/15; ex-Works on Oxley MPD; 4697, 7739. 'Kings' at Stafford Road minus numbers and nameplates: 6001/2/7/12/4/5/7/22. SLS/196211
30/12/1962 Western Regionboundary changes The following former W.R. engines were transferred to the L.M. Region when the depots to which they are allocated became the responsibility of that Region on 1.1.63. The official date of the transfer is December 30th, 1962: D3004/25-9/34-9, D3105-13/5/6/91-4, D3752/5/7, D3950-2/6-8/68-70/73-85/8/95-7, 1002/13/6/9/23/5, 1432/58, 1619/28/32/8/60/3/8, 2210/1/36/89 2845/51/6/66/75/88, 3208/9/17, 3601/5/7/19/25/31/58/60/73, 3709/44/9/70/6/8/82/8/9/92, 3802/6/9/13/5/7/21/5/8/9/31/45/6/9/52/5/7/65, 4105/11/4/20/5/33/40/7-9/53-5/8/65/7/8/71-3/5/6/8/9, 4602/17/45/6/8/65/83/7/96, 4923/46/54/98, 5022/6/31/63/89, 5101/53, 5192, 5606/40/58, 5927/42/83/90/1/4/5, 6129, 6314/64, 6403/24, 6604/9-11/5/8/25/31/2/44/6/63/7/8/71/4/8/9/83/92/4/8, 6803/11/23/7/8/30/1/3/9/42/5/51/3-5/7/8/61/2/4/6/70/1/9, 6903/4/6/7/11/5/6/7/22/5/6/9/30/3/4/52/64/71/6/9/80, 7001/12/4/9/24/6, 7207/18/36, 7414/8/24/6/31/43. 7800-3/6/7/9/10/2/8/9/21-4/7/8, 7905/8/12/5/8/29, 8109, 8464/98, 8718, 9435/63/70/98, 9608/10/3/4/24/30/6/9/46/57/69, 9724/33/53/68/74/82/93, 41201-4/9/31/2/40/1/85, 44835, 45143/5/90, 45283/98, 45406/22, 45572/7, 45660/99, 46401, 46503-27, 48330/47/54/69/402/4/10/2/5/7/8/24/30/6/50/9/60/71/4/5/8, 48724/38/9/68, 73025 6/34-6/90/5/7, 75000/2-4/6/9/20/1/3/4/6/7/9, 78000/2/3/7/8, 80070/8-80/96/8/100/l/2/4/5/31/2/5/6, 82000/3/5/6/9/20/1/31-4, 92001, 92212/3/5/27/8/34/47. SLS/196303

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
24/12/1947 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 3217
Built at Swindon Works
   
16/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (84F)    
30/01/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
24/04/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
18/06/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
26/03/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Banbury (84C)    
16/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (84D)    
11/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 3217    

prev prev